E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5426
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1408
|
Journal Page: 5426
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5426
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5426
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
01/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|