House
|
05/25/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5408
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
01/13/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|