E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4118
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 973
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2781
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
01/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|