Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB356 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Watson S.B. No. 356
22 (Kleinschmidt)
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces
88 inducted into federal service in support of Operations Iraqi
99 Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 431.134, Government
1212 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1313 (a) The adjutant general may adopt rules and regulations
1414 relating to the:
1515 (1) Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
1616 awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed
1717 five years of honorable service during which the person has shown
1818 fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the
1919 state;
2020 (2) Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a
2121 person who was inducted into federal service from the state
2222 military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or after
2323 June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
2424 (3) Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a
2525 member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the
2626 United States who performs outstanding service or attains
2727 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
2828 (4) Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be
2929 presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another
3030 state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior
3131 and clearly outstanding manner;
3232 (5) Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be
3333 awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of
3434 honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person
3535 has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
3636 the state;
3737 (6) Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal,
3838 which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal
3939 service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in
4040 support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm,
4141 without regard to the place that the person was deployed while
4242 serving on active federal military duty;
4343 (7) Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be
4444 awarded to a person who:
4545 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
4646 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
4747 (B) is a member of the state military forces; and
4848 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
4949 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United
5050 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5151 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5252 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
5353 (8) Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a
5454 person who:
5555 (A) served on or after September 11, 2001, in the
5656 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and
5757 (B) served in a hostile fire zone as designated
5858 by the United States secretary of defense;
5959 (9) Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
6060 awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after
6161 September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the
6262 United States secretary of defense;
6363 (10) Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded
6464 to a person who, after September 11, 2001:
6565 (A) was inducted into federal service from the
6666 Texas National Guard; and
6767 (B) meets the criteria for an award of the
6868 federal Purple Heart Medal;
6969 (11) Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
7070 awarded to:
7171 (A) a member of the state military forces who
7272 has:
7373 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
7474 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
7575 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
7676 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
7777 demanding responsibility; or
7878 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
7979 service to the state military forces; [and]
8080 (12) Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which shall
8181 be awarded to a member of the state military forces who served:
8282 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
8383 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
8484 state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States
8585 Code; and
8686 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
8787 mission in the state under civilian authority;
8888 (13) Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
8989 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the
9090 Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the person
9191 was deployed while serving on active federal military duty, after:
9292 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
9393 Freedom; or
9494 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
9595 Dawn; and
9696 (14) Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall be
9797 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the
9898 Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation
9999 Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was
100100 deployed while serving on active federal military duty.
101101 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
102102 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
103103 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
104104 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
105105 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.