E | 05/12/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2310 | |
E | 05/05/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3087 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#630 | Journal Page: 2685 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2663 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2663 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB923 | Journal Page: 2663 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 01/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |