House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |