E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5409
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5409
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1224
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|