House | 05/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Deuell | Journal Page: 1434 |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1411 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1411 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1410 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |