Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB506 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Deuell S.B. No. 506
 (In the Senate - Filed February 2, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 21, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3;
 April 21, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 506 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consumption advisories for mercury contamination in
 fish, crustaceans, molluscan shellfish, and other aquatic and
 terrestrial animals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 436, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 436.092 and 436.093 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 436.092.  SURVEY. (a)  The director shall rely on
 surveys of the levels of mercury and mercury compounds in fish,
 crustaceans, molluscan shellfish, and other aquatic or terrestrial
 animals living in or near bodies of water in or bordering on this
 state that have been conducted by the department to determine
 whether to issue a consumption advisory under Section 436.093.
 (b)  Annually, the director shall notify the public of the
 survey results and of any declaration of a prohibited area or
 consumption advisory necessary based on the survey results.
 (c)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission may adopt rules governing the surveys used or
 public notifications required under this section.
 Sec. 436.093.  CONSUMPTION ADVISORY FOR MERCURY.
 (a)  Annually, the director shall issue or update consumption
 advisories for fish, crustaceans, molluscan shellfish, and other
 aquatic or terrestrial animals living in or near bodies of water in
 or bordering on this state if the surveys under Section 436.092
 indicate that levels of methyl mercury in the tissues of fish or
 other animals that are consumed by the public equal or exceed 0.3
 mg/kg.
 (b)  The director may issue a consumption advisory if the
 survey shows levels lower than 0.3 mg/kg if the director determines
 that the risks of consumption of the animal require an advisory.
 (c)  A consumption advisory must distinguish:
 (1)  risks related to particular fish or other animal
 species; and
 (2)  risks to sensitive or at-risk populations, such as
 children.
 (d)  The director shall, in consultation with the Texas Parks
 and Wildlife Commission and other state or federal agencies, post
 consumption advisories:
 (1)  on the Internet website of the department; and
 (2)  through any other means of public notification
 that the director determines appropriate.
 (e)  In consultation with the department and subject to
 adequate funds, the Parks and Wildlife Commission shall post a
 consumption advisory at each public body of water that is the
 subject of an advisory.
 (f)  The department shall provide on its Internet website a
 map of public bodies of water in this state for which a consumption
 advisory or a consumption ban has been issued.
 (g)  The department shall provide on its Internet website
 information advising the public of the risks of consuming fish or
 other animals covered by a consumption advisory under this section.
 (h)  The department may use its Internet website or other
 means to educate the public about the risks of consumption of fish
 or other animals with elevated levels of mercury or mercury
 compounds.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding Sections 436.092 and 436.093,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a consumption advisory
 is not required to be issued before February 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *