House | 05/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2261 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 1309 |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1309 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1309 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/03/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |