Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB518 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shapiro S.B. No. 518
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 18, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 18, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 518 By:  Shapiro


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to initiatives designed to improve performance of public
 school students, including initiatives specifically for students
 enrolled at the sixth, seventh, and eighth grade levels.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.041, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e), (f), (f-1), and (f-2) to read as follows:
 (e)  In proposing rules under Subsection (b)(2), the board
 shall ensure that a person seeking to teach a subject in the
 foundation curriculum under Section 28.002(a)(1) at the seventh
 grade level or above is required to hold a certificate that
 indicates the person's mastery of the specific subject taught. To
 achieve this result, the board shall not issue a generalist
 certificate that authorizes a person to teach a subject in the
 foundation curriculum under Section 28.002(a)(1) at the seventh
 grade level or above.
 (f)  Subsection (e) applies to initial certificates issued
 on or after September 1, 2012. Subsection (e) does not affect the
 validity of a certificate issued before that date or the
 eligibility of a person holding such a certificate for subsequent
 renewals of the certificate in accordance with board rules.
 (f-1)  In implementing Subsection (e), the board shall
 ensure that the subject area examinations administered to persons
 seeking certificates at the seventh grade level and above in
 English language arts, mathematics, science, or social studies are
 at least as rigorous as the examinations administered before
 September 1, 2013, to persons seeking Grades 8-12 certificates to
 teach in those subject areas.
 (f-2)  Subsection (f-1) and this subsection expire September
 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.4551, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  In addition to the components described by Subsection
 (b), the commissioner shall ensure that each academy developed and
 made available under this section includes a component on providing
 students with writing instruction.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.015.  HIGH SCHOOL READINESS PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 agency shall develop and implement a high school readiness pilot
 program under which:
 (1)  a participating school with students enrolled at
 the sixth, seventh, and eighth grade levels shall enroll all
 students at those levels in a student advisory class; and
 (2)  a participating high school shall provide annual
 high school orientation sessions for parents of students who are
 enrolled at the sixth, seventh, and eighth grade levels in the high
 school's attendance zone.
 (b)  An application to participate in the program may be
 submitted by an individual school or by a school district on behalf
 of multiple schools located in the district. To be eligible to
 participate in the component of the program described by Subsection
 (a)(1), a school must:
 (1)  be a school for which the district in which the
 school is located receives funding under Title I of the Elementary
 and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.)
 or be a school that, as determined by the commissioner, is a
 low-performing school under Chapter 39 or has a high percentage of
 students who are at risk of dropping out of school, as defined by
 Section 29.081(d); and
 (2)  have students enrolled at the seventh and eighth
 grade levels.
 (c)  The agency shall develop standards and guidelines for
 the student advisory class. The standards and guidelines must:
 (1)  at a minimum, require that the class provide
 instruction about:
 (A)  school culture;
 (B)  school procedures;
 (C)  test-taking skills;
 (D)  study skills;
 (E)  positive academic behaviors;
 (F)  civic and community responsibility; and
 (G)  high school and college readiness;
 (2)  permit the class to be offered as an electronic
 course through the state virtual school network under Chapter 30A;
 and
 (3)  provide that the class be taught, if practicable,
 by an educator who does not instruct the enrolled students in other
 course work.
 (d)  The agency shall develop standards and guidelines for
 the high school orientation session. An orientation session must:
 (1)  prepare a parent for the transition to high school
 of the parent's child;
 (2)  allow a parent to meet and interact with high
 school teachers and administrators;
 (3)  provide a parent with information regarding:
 (A)  high school curriculum, including the
 curriculum requirements for the minimum, recommended, and advanced
 high school programs under Section 28.025; and
 (B)  high school options available to the parent's
 child, including any high school magnet programs, academies, or
 similar special programs available in the district;
 (4)  address the role of the parent in assisting the
 parent's child in performing successfully in high school; and
 (5)  provide a parent with a written document that
 addresses frequently asked questions from parents regarding the
 transition to high school.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.100 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.100.  EARLY IDENTIFICATION AND INTERVENTION.
 (a)  Each year a school with students enrolled at the sixth,
 seventh, or eighth grade level shall:
 (1)  identify the students at each of those grade
 levels who are at risk of dropping out of school, as defined by
 Section 29.081(d), or who are likely to become at risk of dropping
 out of school, as determined in accordance with rules adopted by the
 commissioner; and
 (2)  determine the specific interventions that the
 school will use to address the needs of students at each of those
 grade levels who are at risk of dropping out of school, as defined
 by Section 29.081(d).
 (b)  Not later than July 1 of each year, a school with
 students enrolled at a grade level from which students are promoted
 to high school must provide each high school to which students at
 the school are promoted with:
 (1)  the names of students entering the high school at
 the beginning of the next school year that have been identified
 under Subsection (a)(1); and
 (2)  if applicable, the specific interventions used
 with each student named under Subdivision (1).
 (c)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 5.  The commissioner of education shall implement
 Subsection (b-1), Section 21.4551, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, beginning with reading academies offered on or after January
 1, 2012.
 SECTION 6.  The Texas Education Agency shall develop
 standards and guidelines for the student advisory class and high
 school orientation session in compliance with Section 28.015,
 Education Code, as added by this Act, as soon as possible after the
 effective date of this Act. The agency shall fully implement the
 pilot program required by Section 28.015, Education Code, as added
 by this Act, not later than the 2012-2013 school year.
 SECTION 7.  Section 29.100, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the 2012-2013 school year.
 SECTION 8.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012 school year.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *