House | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4062 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2335 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2335 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2335 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 2335 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 2329 |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |