Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB636 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nichols, Gallegos, Patrick S.B. No. 636
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consolidation of more than one water or sewer system
 under a single tariff by an investor-owned utility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 13.145, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A utility may consolidate more than one system under a
 single tariff only if:
 (1)  the regulatory authority finds that, at the time
 the utility applies for a uniform tariff, all of the systems under
 the tariff are substantially similar in terms of facilities,
 quality of service, and cost of service; and
 (2)  the tariff provides for rates that promote water
 conservation for single-family residences and landscape
 irrigation.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 applications for a uniform tariff filed on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An application filed before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 application is filed, and that law is continued in effect for this
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *