E
|
05/20/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
E
|
05/10/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3520
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2947
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#723
|
Journal Page: 2946
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2946
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2946
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2856
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Castro
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2854
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2250
|
Journal Page: 2854
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|