E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3701
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1433
|
Journal Page: 5455
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5455
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5455
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|