House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2262 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1323 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1323 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1323 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1322 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1322 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1322 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |