Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB718 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 718
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 13, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 13, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 718 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disciplinary action taken against public school
 students on the basis of serious misbehavior.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 37.007, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A student may be expelled if the student, while placed
 in an alternative education program for disciplinary reasons,
 continues to engage in serious [or persistent] misbehavior that
 violates the district's student code of conduct.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (c), Section 37.009, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Before it may place a student in a disciplinary
 alternative education program for a period that extends beyond the
 end of the school year, the board or the board's designee must
 determine that:
 (1)  the student's presence in the regular classroom
 program or at the student's regular campus presents a danger of
 physical harm to the student or to another individual; or
 (2)  the student has engaged in serious [or persistent]
 misbehavior that violates the district's student code of conduct.
 SECTION 3.  Subsections (k) and (l), Section 37.011,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (k)  Each school district in a county with a population
 greater than 125,000 and the county juvenile board shall annually
 enter into a joint memorandum of understanding that:
 (1)  outlines the responsibilities of the juvenile
 board concerning the establishment and operation of a juvenile
 justice alternative education program under this section;
 (2)  defines the amount and conditions on payments from
 the school district to the juvenile board for students of the school
 district served in the juvenile justice alternative education
 program whose placement was not made on the basis of an expulsion
 required under Section 37.007(a), (d), or (e);
 (3)  identifies those categories of conduct that the
 school district has defined in its student code of conduct as
 constituting serious [or persistent] misbehavior for which a
 student may be placed in the juvenile justice alternative education
 program;
 (4)  identifies and requires a timely placement and
 specifies a term of placement for expelled students for whom the
 school district has received a notice under Section 52.041(d),
 Family Code;
 (5)  establishes services for the transitioning of
 expelled students to the school district prior to the completion of
 the student's placement in the juvenile justice alternative
 education program;
 (6)  establishes a plan that provides transportation
 services for students placed in the juvenile justice alternative
 education program;
 (7)  establishes the circumstances and conditions
 under which a juvenile may be allowed to remain in the juvenile
 justice alternative education program setting once the juvenile is
 no longer under juvenile court jurisdiction; and
 (8)  establishes a plan to address special education
 services required by law.
 (l)  The school district shall be responsible for providing
 an immediate educational program to students who engage in behavior
 resulting in expulsion under Section 37.007(b), (c), and (f) but
 who are not eligible for admission into the juvenile justice
 alternative education program in accordance with the memorandum of
 understanding required under this section. The school district may
 provide the program or the school district may contract with a
 county juvenile board, a private provider, or one or more other
 school districts to provide the program. The memorandum of
 understanding shall address the circumstances under which such
 students who continue to engage in serious [or persistent]
 misbehavior shall be admitted into the juvenile justice alternative
 education program.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *