E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on adoption of const. amendment
|
SJR 26
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4273
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4273
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4273
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4273
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3152
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|