E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2472 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3866 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3840 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3840 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB3560 | Journal Page: 3840 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1574 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 454 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 454 | |
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |