Senate | 04/20/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 455 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 455 | |
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |