House | 05/02/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |