E | 05/12/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2310 | |
E | 05/06/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2065 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3175 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2047 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#712 | Journal Page: 2872 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2872 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2872 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 5:00 PM | Journal Page: 2816 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2816 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2743 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2743 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1700 | Journal Page: 2743 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 461 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 461 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |