E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4152
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|