Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB943 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R25943 ALL-D
 By: Carona S.B. No. 943
 (Anchia)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 943:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the classification, use, and regulation of electric
 energy storage equipment or facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.002(10), Utilities Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (10)  "Power generation company" means a person that:
 (A)  generates electricity that is intended to be
 sold at wholesale, including the owner or operator of electric
 energy storage equipment or facilities to which Subchapter E,
 Chapter 35, applies;
 (B)  does not own a transmission or distribution
 facility in this state other than an essential interconnecting
 facility, a facility not dedicated to public use, or a facility
 otherwise excluded from the definition of "electric utility" under
 this section; and
 (C)  does not have a certificated service area,
 although its affiliated electric utility or transmission and
 distribution utility may have a certificated service area.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 35, Utilities Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E.  ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE
 Sec. 35.151.  ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE. This subchapter
 applies to electric energy storage equipment or facilities that are
 intended to provide energy or ancillary services at wholesale,
 including electric energy storage equipment or facilities listed on
 a power generation company's registration with the commission or,
 for an exempt wholesale generator, on the generator's registration
 with the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
 Sec. 35.152.  GENERATION ASSETS.  (a)  Electric energy
 storage equipment or facilities that are intended to be used to sell
 energy or ancillary services at wholesale are generation assets.
 (b)  The owner or operator of electric energy storage
 equipment or facilities that are generation assets under Subsection
 (a) is a power generation company and is required to register under
 Section 39.351(a). The owner or operator of the equipment or
 facilities is entitled to:
 (1)  interconnect the equipment or facilities;
 (2)  obtain transmission service for the equipment or
 facilities; and
 (3)  use the equipment or facilities to sell
 electricity or ancillary services at wholesale in a manner
 consistent with the provisions of this title and commission rules
 applicable to a power generation company or an exempt wholesale
 generator.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this section does not
 affect a determination made by the commission in a final order
 issued before December 31, 2010.
 SECTION 3.  Section 31.002(10), Utilities Code, as amended
 by this Act, and Subchapter E, Chapter 35, Utilities Code, as added
 by this Act, may not be construed to determine the regulatory
 treatment of electricity acquired to charge electric energy storage
 equipment or facilities and used solely for the purpose of later
 sale as energy or ancillary services.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The Public Utility Commission of Texas
 shall adopt or revise rules as necessary to implement this Act not
 later than January 1, 2012.
 (b)  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall ensure that
 the Electric Reliability Council of Texas adopts or revises the
 council's protocols, standards, and procedures to implement this
 Act not later than April 1, 2012.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.