House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|