House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2261 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1307 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |