Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB963 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 963
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2011; March 8, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 17, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certification of a person as eligible for disabled
 parking privileges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (f), Section 681.003, Transportation
 Code, as added by Chapter 842 (S.B. 1984), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
 (f)  This subsection applies only to the first application
 for a disabled parking placard submitted by a person [who resides in
 a county with a population of 125,000 or less].  The notarized
 written statement or prescription may be issued by:
 (1)  a person acting under the delegation and
 supervision of a licensed physician in conformance with Subchapter
 B, Chapter 157, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  a physician assistant licensed to practice in this
 state acting as the agent of a licensed physician under Section
 204.202(e), Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *