Senate | 03/31/2011 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 837 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |