Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB99 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte, Birdwell S.B. No. 99
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; March 21, 2011, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; March 21, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 99 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to persons authorized to control the disposition of the
 remains of certain members of the United States armed forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a United States Department of Defense Record of
 Emergency Data, DD Form 93, or a successor form, was in effect at
 the time of death for a decedent who died in a manner described by 10
 U.S.C. Sections 1481(a)(1) through (8), the DD Form 93 controls
 over any other written instrument described by Subsection (a)(1) or
 (g) with respect to designating a person to control the disposition
 of the decedent's remains.  Notwithstanding Subsections (b) and
 (c), the form is legally sufficient if it is properly completed,
 signed by the decedent, and witnessed in the manner required by the
 form.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *