House | 05/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3650 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2270 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2062 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |