Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/14/11  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 9, 2011, and ending on Monday, February 14, 2011.

Impact

If enacted, SCR15 would provide the necessary flexibility for the legislature to manage its schedule without the typical constraints imposed by the requirement for mutual consent for adjournment. This would likely allow lawmakers to allocate their time more effectively and facilitate discussions or decisions that may require an extended period of deliberation. The resolution is an essential procedural step that helps maintain legislative efficiency during critical periods of decision-making and governance.

Summary

SCR15, authored by Senator Whitmire, is a Senate Concurrent Resolution that seeks permission from both houses of the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specific time period from February 9, 2011, to February 14, 2011. The bill addresses a requirement set forth in Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which states that neither house may adjourn for an extended duration without the consent of the other. By proposing this resolution, the intent is to ensure that legislative operations can continue smoothly without being interrupted by strict adherence to this constitutional provision during the set dates.

Sentiment

The sentiment around SCR15 is primarily procedural and technical, focusing on legislative efficiency rather than contentious policy issues. It is largely seen as a reasonable request to ensure the functioning of legislative duties. As such, the overall atmosphere surrounding this bill is neutral, given that it does not provoke significant public debate or opposition. Legislators generally view it as a necessary administrative measure.

Contention

There do not appear to be significant points of contention associated with SCR15, as it merely seeks to modify the legislative schedule within the bounds of the Texas Constitution. However, discussions around such resolutions could reflect broader concerns about legislative flexibility and responsiveness to urgent matters. The resolution is designed to prevent any logistical impediments during a critical legislative period, indicating a desire for operational effectiveness rather than controversy.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.