Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Introduced
2/23/11  
Introduced
2/23/11  
Enrolled
2/28/11  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 23, 2011, and ending on Monday, February 28, 2011.

Impact

This bill underscores the procedural dynamics of legislative sessions in Texas. If approved, SCR21 would facilitate a temporary extension of the legislative break, allowing lawmakers more flexibility in managing their schedule during that specific timeframe. Such a resolution is vital in times where intense legislative negotiations are necessary or during periods of public hearings or bill review processes that could benefit from additional time.

Summary

SCR21 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution proposing to grant permission for the Texas legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specified period, from February 23 to February 28, 2011. The resolution is anchored in the rules established by the Texas Constitution, particularly Article III, Section 17, which stipulates that neither the House nor the Senate may adjourn for over three days without mutual consent.

Sentiment

The general sentiment around SCR21 seems to be pragmatic, focusing on the legislative body's need for cooperation to efficiently manage its time and responsibilities. While there are no overtly opposing sentiments noted in the available documentation, the resolution's nature suggests it would likely be seen favorably by members prioritizing legislative functionality.

Contention

Notably, the resolution's request hinges upon the constitutional requirement of mutual consent between the two houses of the Texas legislature. This aspect can foster meaningful discussions regarding inter-house relations and could potentially spark debates if one house feels that the adjournment is unwarranted or if there are pressing issues that need their attention before a long recess.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.