Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Introduced
3/2/11  
Introduced
3/2/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 2, 2011, and ending on Monday, March 7, 2011.

Impact

The proposed changes in SCR23 would have significant implications for existing local government regulations. If passed, it would curtail the ability of municipalities to tailor laws to their specific contexts, particularly in areas like environmental protections, labor laws, and public health measures. The legislation is seen as a shift towards centralization of regulatory authority at the state level, which may diminish local governments' responsiveness to their constituents' needs. Critics warn this could lead to a reduction in essential protections that are sometimes necessary for addressing local challenges.

Summary

SCR23 is a legislative proposal that aims to redefine the relationship between state and local governments regarding regulatory powers. The bill intends to streamline regulations affecting businesses by prohibiting local entities from enacting ordinances that duplicate or exceed state regulations. Proponents argue that by creating a more uniform regulatory landscape, the bill will ease the compliance burdens on businesses, ultimately fostering economic growth and development throughout the state.

Sentiment

The discussion surrounding SCR23 appears to be highly contentious. Supporters of the bill emphasize the importance of consistency in regulations to encourage business investments and eliminate confusion. They believe that the bill will promote state-wide economic resilience. Conversely, opponents argue that the measure is an infringement on local democracy and undermines the authority of local governments to address unique community needs. This sentiment reflects a broader debate in policy making about the balance of power between state and local authorities.

Contention

Key points of contention around SCR23 center on the degree to which local governments should maintain their regulatory autonomy. Advocates of local governance assert that authorities closest to the community are best positioned to determine regulations that align with their residents’ interests. Detractors suggest that a one-size-fits-all approach is more effective for ensuring that businesses can operate smoothly across jurisdictions. This centralization of authority could provoke significant pushback from local leaders and advocacy groups who prioritize localized decision-making.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.