E | 03/16/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 587 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 830 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 530 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Record vote | RV#53 | Journal Page: 468 |
House | 03/10/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 741 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 741 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |