Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Introduced
3/9/11  
Introduced
3/9/11  
Enrolled
3/14/11  

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 9, 2011, and ending on Monday, March 14, 2011.

Impact

If passed, SCR24 would allow the legislature to extend its recess beyond the typical three-day limit. This could provide additional time for legislators to engage in discussions, consultations, or to gather further public input on pressing legislative matters. Such measures can be essential during busy periods or in the context of significant bills that require more deliberation or negotiation among lawmakers.

Summary

SCR24 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution proposing that the Texas Legislature grants permission for both the House and the Senate to adjourn for longer than the standard three days. The resolution specifies the period of adjournment, commencing from March 9, 2011, through March 14, 2011. The purpose behind SCR24 reflects the flexibility and practical needs of legislative scheduling within the confines of the Texas Constitution, which traditionally limits the duration of adjournment without mutual consent.

Sentiment

The sentiment around SCR24 appears to be generally practical as it pertains to legislative procedure rather than highly controversial subject matter. There is likely support from members who recognize the need for flexibility in scheduling during a legislative session. However, discussions might include a degree of concern regarding procedural transparency and the necessity for adequate checks and balances in legislative operations.

Contention

While SCR24 is primarily procedural, any proposal that modifies how legislative bodies operate can elicit questions regarding its necessity and implications. Critics may argue that such resolutions can lead to abuse of power or unnecessary delays in legislative processes. However, proponents would emphasize that this resolution is merely a tool for efficiency and continuity during the legislature's work, rather than a fundamental alteration of existing laws or practices.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.