E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2515 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2553 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2485 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4068 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4068 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2550 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 582 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 582 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |