E | 04/01/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 902 | |
E | 03/24/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 772 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 738 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 772 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Again read | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 945 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 945 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 864 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |