E
|
05/27/2011
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5175
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1369
|
Journal Page: 5175
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 5175
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5175
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1164
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1129
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 504
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 504
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|