Senate | 06/14/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 06/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 454 | |
House | 06/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 391 | |
House | 06/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#67 | Journal Page: 391 |
House | 06/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 391 | |
House | 06/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 391 | |
House | 06/10/2011 | Record vote | RV#64 | Journal Page: 385 |
House | 06/10/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 06/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 06/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 06/06/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 06/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 06/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 18 | |
House | 06/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/01/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 06/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 05/31/2011 | Filed |