House | 06/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 06/20/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 06/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 06/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 06/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 06/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 514 | |
House | 06/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 514 | |
House | 06/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 454 | |
Senate | 06/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 06/15/2011 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 06/15/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 743 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Point of order | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA12 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 738 |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Motion fails | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Motion to reconsider | FA4 | Journal Page: 735 |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 06/14/2011 | Motion to suspend rules | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 06/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 06/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 06/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 06/09/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 06/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 408 | |
Senate | 06/02/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |