Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1018 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Patrick, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1018
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of community partnerships and the
 development of policy recommendations for increasing physical
 activity and improving fitness among public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.004, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c) and (m) and adding Subsections (l-1) and
 (n) to read as follows:
 (c)  The local school health advisory council's duties
 include recommending:
 (1)  the number of hours of instruction to be provided
 in health education;
 (2)  curriculum appropriate for specific grade levels
 designed to prevent obesity, cardiovascular disease, and Type 2
 diabetes through coordination of:
 (A)  health education;
 (B)  physical education and physical activity;
 (C)  nutrition services;
 (D)  parental involvement; and
 (E)  instruction to prevent the use of tobacco;
 (3)  appropriate grade levels and methods of
 instruction for human sexuality instruction; [and]
 (4)  strategies for integrating the curriculum
 components specified by Subdivision (2) with the following elements
 in a coordinated school health program for the district:
 (A)  school health services;
 (B)  counseling and guidance services;
 (C)  a safe and healthy school environment; and
 (D)  school employee wellness; and
 (5)  if feasible, joint use agreements or strategies
 for collaboration between the school district and community
 organizations or agencies.
 (l-1)  The local school health advisory council shall
 establish a physical activity and fitness planning subcommittee to
 consider issues relating to student physical activity and fitness
 and make policy recommendations to increase physical activity and
 improve fitness among students.
 (m)  In addition to performing other duties, the local school
 health advisory council shall submit to the board of trustees, at
 least annually, a written report that includes:
 (1)  any council recommendation concerning the school
 district's health education curriculum and instruction or related
 matters that the council has not previously submitted to the board;
 (2)  any suggested modification to a council
 recommendation previously submitted to the board; [and]
 (3)  a detailed explanation of the council's activities
 during the period between the date of the current report and the
 date of the last prior written report; and
 (4)  any recommendations made by the physical activity
 and fitness planning subcommittee.
 (n)  Any joint use agreement that a school district and
 community organization or agency enter into based on a
 recommendation of the local school health advisory council under
 Subsection (c)(5) must address liability for the school district
 and community organization or agency in the agreement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *