House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 432 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 432 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Filed |