1 | 1 | | By: M. Gonzalez of El Paso, Nevarez H.B. No. 1081 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
5 | 5 | | Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 15, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; |
---|
7 | 7 | | May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to a study regarding the prohibition of dairy farming in |
---|
13 | 13 | | certain areas of the state. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this Act: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) "Commission" means the Texas Animal Health |
---|
17 | 17 | | Commission. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) "Department" means the Department of State Health |
---|
19 | 19 | | Services. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) The commission shall conduct a study regarding the |
---|
21 | 21 | | current risk level for bovine tuberculosis, as determined |
---|
22 | 22 | | epidemiologically and defined by rule of the commission, in areas |
---|
23 | 23 | | of this state determined by the commission by rule to be infected |
---|
24 | 24 | | with or at high risk for bovine tuberculosis. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) Not later than September 1, 2014, the commission shall |
---|
26 | 26 | | submit a report regarding the results of the study to the Department |
---|
27 | 27 | | of Agriculture, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the House |
---|
28 | 28 | | Committee on Agriculture and Livestock, the Senate Committee on |
---|
29 | 29 | | Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security, the House |
---|
30 | 30 | | Committee on Public Health, and the Senate Committee on Health and |
---|
31 | 31 | | Human Services. The report must include: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) to the extent possible, an assessment of the risk |
---|
33 | 33 | | level for bovine tuberculosis presented by areas in Mexico |
---|
34 | 34 | | bordering this state; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) to the extent possible, a description of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | efforts taken by the Ministry of Agriculture, Livestock, Rural |
---|
37 | 37 | | Development, Fisheries and Food and other agencies of the United |
---|
38 | 38 | | Mexican States to eliminate bovine tuberculosis in the state of |
---|
39 | 39 | | Chihuahua and other areas; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) a description of the current practices adopted by |
---|
41 | 41 | | the United States Department of Agriculture and the commission to |
---|
42 | 42 | | eliminate bovine tuberculosis; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (4) an assessment of the risk level for bovine |
---|
44 | 44 | | tuberculosis for the state if dairy farming were to occur in areas |
---|
45 | 45 | | determined by the commission by rule to be infected with or at high |
---|
46 | 46 | | risk for bovine tuberculosis; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (5) an assessment of whether the areas determined by |
---|
48 | 48 | | the commission by rule to be infected with or at high risk for |
---|
49 | 49 | | bovine tuberculosis could be decreased in size. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (d) As soon as practicable, the commission shall present the |
---|
51 | 51 | | report regarding the results of the study at an open meeting of the |
---|
52 | 52 | | commission. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (e) This Act expires October 1, 2014. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
55 | 55 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
56 | 56 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
57 | 57 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
58 | 58 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
59 | 59 | | * * * * * |
---|