Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1081 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: M. Gonzalez of El Paso, Nevarez H.B. No. 1081
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 15, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the prohibition of dairy farming in
 certain areas of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Animal Health
 Commission.
 (2)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study regarding the
 current risk level for bovine tuberculosis, as determined
 epidemiologically and defined by rule of the commission, in areas
 of this state determined by the commission by rule to be infected
 with or at high risk for bovine tuberculosis.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2014, the commission shall
 submit a report regarding the results of the study to the Department
 of Agriculture, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the House
 Committee on Agriculture and Livestock, the Senate Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security, the House
 Committee on Public Health, and the Senate Committee on Health and
 Human Services. The report must include:
 (1)  to the extent possible, an assessment of the risk
 level for bovine tuberculosis presented by areas in Mexico
 bordering this state;
 (2)  to the extent possible, a description of the
 efforts taken by the Ministry of Agriculture, Livestock, Rural
 Development, Fisheries and Food and other agencies of the United
 Mexican States to eliminate bovine tuberculosis in the state of
 Chihuahua and other areas;
 (3)  a description of the current practices adopted by
 the United States Department of Agriculture and the commission to
 eliminate bovine tuberculosis;
 (4)  an assessment of the risk level for bovine
 tuberculosis for the state if dairy farming were to occur in areas
 determined by the commission by rule to be infected with or at high
 risk for bovine tuberculosis; and
 (5)  an assessment of whether the areas determined by
 the commission by rule to be infected with or at high risk for
 bovine tuberculosis could be decreased in size.
 (d)  As soon as practicable, the commission shall present the
 report regarding the results of the study at an open meeting of the
 commission.
 (e)  This Act expires October 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *