House
|
04/29/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 8, Section 21
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 6, Section 7 and Rule 6, Section 17
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#374
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
3-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
2-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Ritter, Simmons, and Creighton
|
Journal Page: 2007
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/29/13 3:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
01/10/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|