Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1120 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Riddle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 1120
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of the Texas Crime Stoppers Council to
 encourage individuals to report criminal activity related to
 trafficking of persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 414.005, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 414.005.  DUTIES. The council shall:
 (1)  encourage, advise, and assist in the creation of
 crime stoppers organizations;
 (2)  foster the detection of crime and encourage
 persons to report information about criminal acts;
 (3)  encourage news and other media to broadcast
 reenactments and to inform the public of the functions of crime
 stoppers organizations' operations and programs;
 (4)  promote the process of crime stoppers
 organizations to forward information about criminal acts to the
 appropriate law enforcement agencies;
 (5)  help law enforcement agencies detect and combat
 crime by increasing the flow of information to and between law
 enforcement agencies;
 (6)  create specialized programs targeted at detecting
 specific crimes or types of crimes, including at least one program
 that:
 (A)  encourages individuals to report sex
 offenders who have failed to register under Chapter 62, Code of
 Criminal Procedure; [and]
 (B)  encourages individuals to report criminal
 activity relating to the trafficking of persons, as described under
 Chapter 20A, Penal Code; and
 (C)  financially rewards each individual who
 makes a report described by Paragraph (A) or (B) that leads or
 substantially contributes to the arrest or apprehension:
 (i)  of a sex offender who has failed to
 register under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure; or
 (ii)  of a person suspected of engaging in
 conduct that constitutes an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code;
 and
 (7)  encourage, advise, and assist crime stoppers
 organizations in implementing any programs created under
 Subdivision (6), including a program specifically described by
 Subdivision (6).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *