Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1186 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1186
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 25, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 25, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Racing Commission's ability to share
 investigatory information with other state regulatory agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.15, Texas Racing Act (Article 179e,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2.15. RECORDS.  (a) All records of the commission that
 are not made confidential by other law are open to inspection by the
 public during regular office hours. All applications for a license
 under this Act shall be maintained by the commission and shall be
 available for public inspection during regular office hours.
 (b)  The contents of the investigatory files of the
 commission[, however,] are not public records and are confidential
 except in a criminal proceeding, in a hearing conducted by the
 commission, on court order, or with the consent of the party being
 investigated.
 (c)  The commission may share with another regulatory agency
 of this state any investigatory file information that creates a
 reasonable suspicion of a person's violation of a law or rule under
 that agency's jurisdiction. The agency may use the information as
 if it was obtained through that agency's investigatory process.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *