Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1193 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1193
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of bailiffs for certain district
 courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.002(f), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  The judges of the 12th, 106th, 229th, 258th, 278th,
 381st, and 411th district courts may each appoint a bailiff. At the
 discretion of the judge, a bailiff may serve the court in each
 county of the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *