House | 04/25/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 387 | Journal Page: 1840 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Filed |