E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2909
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#467
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Wu
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/1/13 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
House
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|